This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 07:53:23 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. VS Urbi

Case Summary

On 08/16/2010 Citibank South Dakota N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Urbi. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1474

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A.

Alfonso F. Urbi

Janalie Henriques

 

Court Documents

Proposed Judgment Request

04/15/2011: Proposed Judgment Request

Declaration Request

04/15/2011: Declaration Request

Declaration Other: Request RE: interest

04/15/2011: Declaration Other: Request RE: interest

Proposed Judgment Request

02/17/2011: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request unjust enrichment claim, as to all defts

02/17/2011: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request unjust enrichment claim, as to all defts

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

02/17/2011: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

12/31/2012: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Default Judgment (Money) Entered grant of default money judgment

04/15/2011: Default Judgment (Money) Entered grant of default money judgment

Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed Filing request for default clerk money judgment

04/15/2011: Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed Filing request for default clerk money judgment

Default Entered as to Alfonso F. Urbi. Judgment NOT Entered; Rejection Letter Issued enter default, reject judgment

02/17/2011: Default Entered as to Alfonso F. Urbi. Judgment NOT Entered; Rejection Letter Issued enter default, reject judgment

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Alfonso F. Urbi Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

02/17/2011: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Alfonso F. Urbi Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfonso F. Urbi Filed

10/04/2010: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfonso F. Urbi Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

08/16/2010: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.

08/16/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.

Complaint - Collections Filed

08/16/2010: Complaint - Collections Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketMessage: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution Issued To Los Angeles; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketMessage: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Default Judgment (Money) Entered; Category: Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Default Judgment (Money); Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Proposed Judgment Request; Category: ZZZ005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Request; Category: DCL041

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request RE: interest; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Proposed Judgment Request; Category: ZZZ005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request unjust enrichment claim, as to all defts; Category: REQ051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request; Category: DCL051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Default Entered as to Alfonso F. Urbi. Judgment NOT Entered; Rejection Letter Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Alfonso F. Urbi Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alfonso F. Urbi Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota) N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant