This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 07:33:54 (UTC).

Citibank (South Dakota), N.A. VS Beuchat

Case Summary

On 05/21/2010 Citibank South Dakota , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Beuchat. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7514

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

Harvey Beuchat

Ray Mahdavi

 

Court Documents

Proposed Judgment Request

09/02/2010: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

09/02/2010: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

Declaration Other: Request

09/02/2010: Declaration Other: Request

Writ of Execution - Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed Los Angeles

05/16/2014: Writ of Execution - Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed Los Angeles

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

08/19/2013: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed Los Angeles

05/22/2012: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed Los Angeles

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.

07/21/2011: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.

Default Judgment (Money) Entered Default & Default Judgment (Money)

09/02/2010: Default Judgment (Money) Entered Default & Default Judgment (Money)

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Harvey Beuchat Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

09/02/2010: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Harvey Beuchat Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Harvey Beuchat Filed

06/29/2010: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Harvey Beuchat Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

05/21/2010: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.

05/21/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.

Complaint - Collections Filed

05/21/2010: Complaint - Collections Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2014
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution - Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketMessage: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Los Angeles Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution Issued To Los Angeles; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • DocketMessage: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Default Judgment (Money) Entered; Category: Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proposed Judgment Request; Category: ZZZ005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request; Category: REQ051

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Default Judgment (Money); Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As to Harvey Beuchat Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Harvey Beuchat Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Harvey Beuchat Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketMessage: File Control File sent to HHJ; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant