This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/22/2022 at 01:36:27 (UTC).

Citibank N.A. VS Vieyra

Case Summary

On 03/06/2009 Citibank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vieyra. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9808

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

Keith J Vieyra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Janalie Henriques

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

09/29/2009: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed

09/23/2009: Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/22/2009: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

07/22/2009: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed

07/20/2009: Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

03/12/2009: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2009 02:30 PM D- 607

03/12/2009: Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2009 02:30 PM D- 607

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

03/06/2009: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank N.A.

03/06/2009: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank N.A.

Complaint - Collections Filed

03/06/2009: Complaint - Collections Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • DocketMessage: Court File Transfer to Fremont Hall of Justice; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance 09/30/2009 02:30 PM D- 607; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Citibank N.A. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2009 02:30 PM D- 607; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE