This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 19:41:41 (UTC).

Ci Quercus Corporation Inc. a Delaware corporatio VS Woolner

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Ci Quercus Corporation Inc a Delaware corporatio filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Woolner. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4479

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARBORWELL LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CI QUERCUS CORPORATION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SAVATREE, LLC

Defendants

ARBOR MD TREE CARE INC

DICKINSON, MATT

HAGGE, DOUG

WOOLNER, NEIL

YAMAGUCHI, KRIS

LAVELLE, ANDREW G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MUNZINGER, RICHARD F.

GEE, AUDREY A.

MARCHIANO, DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

9/14/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Initial Case Management Conference 11/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

7/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Amended Notice of Motion / Demurrer to Complaint Filed

10/1/2021: Amended Notice of Motion / Demurrer to Complaint Filed

Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Neil Woolner, Matt Dickinson, Kris Yamaguchi, Doug Hagge, Arbor MD Tr

10/1/2021: Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Neil Woolner, Matt Dickinson, Kris Yamaguchi, Doug Hagge, Arbor MD Tr

Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Neil Woolner, Andrew G. Lavelle

9/27/2021: Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Neil Woolner, Andrew G. Lavelle

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Ci Quercus Corporation Inc. a Delaware corporation,

9/30/2021: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Ci Quercus Corporation Inc. a Delaware corporation,

Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to Complaint

9/28/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to Complaint

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Notice of Filed

8/26/2021: Notice of Filed

Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order Denied

8/19/2021: Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order Denied

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

8/11/2021: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

8/11/2021: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

8/11/2021: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

8/11/2021: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

8/12/2021: Application Re: Extension of Time Granted

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted in Part

8/16/2021: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted in Part

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

8/6/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support (Brandon V Staccener) Pltff's Exparte Application for an OST Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Ex-parte Application Order Shortening Time on Pltff's Motion to Designate Case as comp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Neil Woolner, Matt Dickinson, Kris Yamaguchi, Doug Hagge, Arbor MD Tr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Motion / Demurrer to Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Demurrer to Complaint 12/21/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kris Yamaguchi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Doug Hagge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Matt Dickinson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/23/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ci Quercus Corporation Inc. a Delaware corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARBORWELL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEE, AUDREY A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marchiano, David M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Fritz Munzinger