Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:33:01 (UTC).

Chung VS Siner & Siner Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/02/2001 Chung filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Siner Siner Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CLIF CAPDEVIELLE, and SCOTT HANDELMAN, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7169

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CLIF CAPDEVIELLE,

SCOTT HANDELMAN, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHUNG, LARRY Y.

CHUNG, MAY W.

Defendant

SINER & SINER CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff

4/2/2001: Claim of Plaintiff

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

4/4/2001: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

5/24/2001: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

7/19/2001: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

7/19/2001: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Clif Capdevielle, Pro Tem Judge; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Scott Handelman, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2001
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 07/19/2001 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service found defective As to Siner & Siner Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/24/2001 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less