This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 08:15:35 (UTC).

Christner-Lile VS Stoneridge Townhouses

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Christner-Lile filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stoneridge Townhouses. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6355

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTNER-LILE , DONNA

Defendants

COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT

STONERIDGE TOWNHOUSES HOA

STONERIDGE TOWNHOUSES

STONERIDGE TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DALBY, ROBERT A.

FRYRE, KATHERINE E.

GARBER, BRENNAIN

PEEBLES, DIANNE D

PEEBLES, DIANNE

LEFF, SAMUEL A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

8/24/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

8/24/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

9/24/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

9/29/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Case Management Statement of Stoneridge Townhouses , Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association,

8/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Stoneridge Townhouses , Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association,

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

8/20/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

8/21/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

Hearing Reset to Pretrial Conference 04/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

8/21/2020: Hearing Reset to Pretrial Conference 04/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

8/21/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses HOA Filed

10/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses HOA Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Community Association Management Filed

10/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Community Association Management Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses Filed

10/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses Filed

Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

11/6/2019: Notice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

9/24/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

9/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/24/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

9/26/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/26/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/03/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Pretrial Conference 04/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Stoneridge Townhouses , Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Donna Christner-Lile Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Stoneridge Townhouses Homeowners' Association, Inc., Community Associa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Lead Attorney Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Community Association Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Stoneridge Townhouses HOA Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Christner-Lile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARBER, BRENNAIN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freyre, Katherine Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEEBLES, DIANE