This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 20:05:37 (UTC).

Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporation VS Drexler

Case Summary

On 04/02/1998 Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N A , a corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Drexler. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEOFFREY CARTER and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7383

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

GEOFFREY CARTER

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Other and Plaintiff

CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, N.A., A CORPORATION

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant

DREXLER, MARK E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAVIS, SHEDRICK O.

ESKANOS, IRWIN J.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed

6/17/2003: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

5/30/2002: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

3/29/2002: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

3/8/2002: Proof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporat

8/27/2001: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporat

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporation

8/11/1999: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporation

Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

12/28/1998: Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

Default Judgment (Money) Entered

11/17/1998: Default Judgment (Money) Entered

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed for Mark E. Drexler

11/17/1998: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed for Mark E. Drexler

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

11/10/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Civil OSC - Complaints 11/10/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

9/29/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 11/10/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Summons with Proof of Service As to Mark E. Drexler Filed

5/4/1998: Summons with Proof of Service As to Mark E. Drexler Filed

Complaint Money Filed

4/2/1998: Complaint Money Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Default Clerk Judgment For Money; Judge: Geoffrey Carter; Department: Dept 137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • DocketProof of Service on Order of Examination Valid As to Mark E. Drexler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Order of Examination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2002
  • DocketOrder of Examination 03/29/2002 02:00 PM D- 137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2002
  • DocketCivil Order of Examination Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., a corporat

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/1998
  • DocketDefault Judgment (Money)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Filed for Mark E. Drexler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1998
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 01/11/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1998
  • DocketSanctions Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 11/10/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to Mark E. Drexler Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Money Filed

    Read MoreRead Less