This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 18:55:14 (UTC).

CHASE BANK USA, N.A. VS DUMITRESCU

Case Summary

On 05/27/2010 CHASE BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUMITRESCU. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8010

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

A DUMITRESCU

Peter R. Osterman

Shedrick O. Davis

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

11/29/2011: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

Association of Attorneys Filed

11/29/2011: Association of Attorneys Filed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 514

09/09/2011: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 514

Case Management Statement of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. Filed

10/04/2010: Case Management Statement of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. Filed

Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Granted exparte judgment pursuant to stip granted

10/01/2010: Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Granted exparte judgment pursuant to stip granted

Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A. with stay of entry to provide for installment payments

09/30/2010: Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A. with stay of entry to provide for installment payments

Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 607

09/10/2010: Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 607

Rejection Letter Issued on Conditional Settlement

09/01/2010: Rejection Letter Issued on Conditional Settlement

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

09/01/2010: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Proof of Service on Complaint As to A DUMITRESCU Filed

06/17/2010: Proof of Service on Complaint As to A DUMITRESCU Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

06/04/2010: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 10/13/2010 02:30 PM D- 607

06/04/2010: Initial Case Management Conference 10/13/2010 02:30 PM D- 607

Summons on Complaint Issued

05/27/2010: Summons on Complaint Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

05/27/2010: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

Complaint - Collections Filed

05/27/2010: Complaint - Collections Filed

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2013
  • DocketMessage: File Control Paper File Verified & Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • DocketMessage: Association of Attorneys Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of CHASE BANK USA, N.A. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Granted; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 607 date: 10/13/2010 time: 02:30 PM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 12/29/2015 02:30 PM D- 607; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketMessage: Rejection Letter Issued on Conditional Settlement; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • DocketMessage: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to A DUMITRESCU Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Court File Transfer to Fremont Hall of Justice; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2010
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 10/13/2010 02:30 PM D- 607; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CHASE BANK USA, N.A.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant