This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 01:49:14 (UTC).

Charney VS Lantern Bay Owners Association

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Charney filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lantern Bay Owners Association. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENTRISH SATARZADEH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0445

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENTRISH SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

CHARNEY, ROSS

Defendant and Other

LANTERN BAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

Judgment Entered

1/27/2020: Judgment Entered

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

1/22/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

1/22/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

1/22/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

1/22/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

10/31/2019: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

10/24/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

10/24/2019: Small Claims Court Trial 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less