This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 09:33:40 (UTC).

Chapman VS Ralph Partners II LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 Chapman filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Ralph Partners II LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0843

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAPMAN, SABRENA

Defendants

WEDGEWOOD PROPERTIES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RALPH PARTNERS II LLC

CLEAR RECON CORP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, P. KURT

DETTELBACH, ALAN M

WINTERS, FRED TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

9/4/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Clear Recon Corp, a California corporation

8/17/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Clear Recon Corp, a California corporation

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/7/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Dropped

7/7/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Dropped

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralph Partners II LLC Filed

6/4/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralph Partners II LLC Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properti

6/4/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properti

Notice of of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed

6/15/2020: Notice of of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/16/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued

6/16/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued

Reply Filed

5/1/2020: Reply Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

4/14/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion Rescheduled

4/14/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion Rescheduled

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

2/26/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

Answer to Complaint Filed for Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properties Inc, a California corporat

2/6/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properties Inc, a California corporat

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sabrena Chapman

1/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sabrena Chapman

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/17/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 12/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

1/22/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 12/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/22/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Clear Recon Corp, a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properties Inc, a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 15 date: 07/07/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing Confirmed for 04/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Ralph Partners II LLC, Wedgewood Properties Inc, a California corporat

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sabrena Chapman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less