This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 08:26:17 (UTC).

Central Valley Builders VS PR Framing LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Central Valley Builders filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PR Framing LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3172

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL VALLEY BUILDERS

CENTRAL VALLEY BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, INC.

CHOY, PETER

EBERHARDT, RICK

H&H INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC

PR FRAMING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HARDY, DANIEL D.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 01/24/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

7/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/24/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/29/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

6/29/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/24/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL VALLEY BUILDERS SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant