This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 17:50:26 (UTC).

Central Valley Builders Suppl VS Livermore Multifamily Owner

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Central Valley Builders Suppl filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Livermore Multifamily Owner. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Nol Wise. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2791

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Nol Wise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL VALLEY BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.

Defendants

KATERRA CONSTRUCTION LLC

LIVERMORE MULTIFAMILY OWNER LLC

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

UNLIMITED FRAMING, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Alison Roades-Brown

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

9/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

09/15/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders Supply, Inc.

09/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders Supply, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

09/15/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

09/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

09/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

09/20/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 12/20/2021 to 12/23/2021 Status changed from Filed and Received to Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/23/2021; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Central valley builders suppl on 09/15/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Central Valley Builders Supply, Inc. as to the entire action; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Central Valley Builders Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff) As to: Livermore Multifamily Owner LLC (Defendant); PNC Bank, National Association (Defendant); Unlimited Framing, Inc (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Central Valley Builders Supply, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Construction LLC Jointly Administered under 21-31861. is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVERMORE MULTIFAMILY OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL VALLEY BUILDERS SUPPLY is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant