Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 03:04:54 (UTC).

Center for Environmental Health VS Cornerstone Apparel, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Center for Environmental Health filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Cornerstone Apparel, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN and WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3923

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

CENTER FOR ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH, A NON-PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants, Debtor / Appellees and Cross Plaintiffs

CORNERSTONE APPAREL, INC.

WINSTON & BLUE, INC.

DESS, INC.

MYSTIC, INC.

BOOHOO.COM UK LIMITED

BOOHOO.COM USA, INC.

BOOHOO.COM USA LIMITED

WALMART, INC.

JET.COM, INC

NASTY GAL LIMITED

NASTY GAL.COM UK LTD.

ORLY SHOE CORP.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WALMART, INC.

JET.COM, INC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

MYSTIC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HIRSCH, HOWARD

GEOCARIS, JAMES A.

KIM, STEVEN C.

LEVIN, ANGELA JEAN

VANWYNGARDEN, THOMAS L.

JEFFRIES, FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/16/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/10/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/14/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

6/16/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

Answer to Complaint Filed for Nasty Gal.Com UK Ltd.

5/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Nasty Gal.Com UK Ltd.

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

1/30/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Request Re: Extension of Time Filed for Walmart, Inc.

12/6/2019: Request Re: Extension of Time Filed for Walmart, Inc.

Motion Filed by Center for Environmental Health, a non-profit corporation

11/27/2019: Motion Filed by Center for Environmental Health, a non-profit corporation

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/4/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

10/9/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Motion Filed by Center for Environmental Health, a non-profit corporation

9/12/2019: Motion Filed by Center for Environmental Health, a non-profit corporation

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/12/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Boohoo.com USA Limited Filed

7/2/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Boohoo.com USA Limited Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/26/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

2/13/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Walmart, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Partial As to Jet.com, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Cornerstone Apparel, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Dess, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 04/02/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 02/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Toxic Tort/Environmental Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Center for Environmental Health, a non-profit corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINSTON & BLUE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NASTY GAL LIMITED is a litigant