Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 03:13:08 (UTC).

Center for Environment Health VS Bali Leathers Inc

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Center for Environment Health filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Bali Leathers Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9736

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTER FOR ENVIRONMENT HEALTH

Defendants

NIKE USA INC

AM RETAIL GROUP INC

LOWES COMPANIES INC

CARHARTT INC

WEST CHESTER HOLDING INC

NIKE INC

ZARA USA INC

DOLGEN CALIFORNIA LLC

HOME DEPOT USA INC

LOWES HOME CENTER LLC

PETZL AMERICA INC

G-III APPAREL GROUP LTD

GORDINI USA INC

DOLGENCORP LLC

PROTECTIVE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTS INC

BALI LEATHERS INC

TOUR EDGE MANUFACTURING INC

DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION

HARBOR FREIGHT TOOLS USA, INC.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SOMERS, ERIC S.

NYE, BRUCE

MARGULIES, JEFFREY B.

ROSENLUND, PAUL S.

FIORENTINO, LYNN R

PARKER, JEFFREY

HOMER, ANDREW W.

RECK, BELYNDA S.

SANGSTER, EDWARD P

LANDIS, RYAN S

STEWART, GILLIAM F.

LANDIS, RYAN

BOYKINS, TAHIR

ADAMS, NADIA DARKAZALLI

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/27/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Ultra Marketing, Inc. Filed

5/11/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Ultra Marketing, Inc. Filed

Notice of Of Appearance of Councel for Defendant Filed

3/25/2021: Notice of Of Appearance of Councel for Defendant Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

2/16/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Midwest Quality Gloves

2/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Midwest Quality Gloves

Dismissal As to Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc. Entered

12/28/2020: Dismissal As to Defendant: Ross Stores, Inc. Entered

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Black & Decker Corporation Filed

6/19/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Black & Decker Corporation Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

6/22/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: LFS, Inc. Entered

6/24/2020: Dismissal As to Defendant: LFS, Inc. Entered

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zara USA Inc Filed

9/11/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zara USA Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lowes Companies Inc Filed

9/17/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lowes Companies Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nike USA Inc Filed

8/27/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nike USA Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dollar General Corporation Filed

8/16/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dollar General Corporation Filed

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Ultra Marketing, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Ultra Marketing, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/30/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Sam's West, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Petzl America Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tour Edge Manufacturing Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Bali Leathers Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Gordini USA Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/17/2019 09:01 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 09/11/2019 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Toxic Tort/Environmental Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Center for Environment Health

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETZL AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARHARTT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GORDINI USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST CHESTER HOLDING INC is a litigant