This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 08:17:38 (UTC).

Cedras VS Thomas

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Cedras filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8261

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDRAS , RICHARD ERIC

Defendant

THOMAS , JOHN ITHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BAGHDADI, KHALDOUN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/10/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

8/10/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

8/9/2021: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

8/9/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

8/19/2021: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

Summons Issued and Filed

9/9/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to John Ithon Thomas Filed

9/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to John Ithon Thomas Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to John Ithon Thomas Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard Eric Cedras

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGHDADI KHALDOUN