This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 02:37:50 (UTC).

Caulfield VS California State Transportation Authority

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Caulfield filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against California State Transportation Authority. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5990

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

CAULFIELD, THOMAS

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

CALIFORNIA STATE TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

1/15/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

1/16/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

1/16/2020: Judgment Entered

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

12/16/2019: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/6/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/16/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less