This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 06:47:41 (UTC).

Caton VS Johnson

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Caton filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5139

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CATON , CURTIS

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

JOHNSON , LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BAILEY, MICHAEL J.

SABHARWAL, SUNENA

 

Court Documents

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

4/13/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Curtis Caton

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Curtis Caton

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

4/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Summons Issued and Filed

4/27/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/27/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

7/21/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

Cross-Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

7/21/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

7/21/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

7/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Posting Jury Fee Filed

8/23/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fee Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Curtis Caton

9/1/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Curtis Caton

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Curtis Caton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Linda Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Curtis Caton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABHARWAL, SUNENA