This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 03:33:53 (UTC).

Catolos VS Navarette

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Catolos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Navarette. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6319

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATOLOS , MELISSA C.

Defendant

NAVARETTE , CLARISA EVER PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SEGAL, PHILIP A.

HILL, GEOFFREY T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/22/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/08/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

4/22/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/08/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/20/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melissa C. Catolos

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melissa C. Catolos

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

4/20/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

6/3/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette

6/3/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

7/2/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Statement of Melissa C. Catolos Filed

8/31/2021: Case Management Statement of Melissa C. Catolos Filed

Case Management Statement of Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette Filed

8/24/2021: Case Management Statement of Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Melissa C. Catolos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/23/2023 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/26/2023 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/23/2023 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/02/2021 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Clarisa Ever Perez Navarette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/08/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Melissa C. Catolos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL GEOFFREY T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEGAL, PHILIP A.