This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 03:34:09 (UTC).

Castillo VS Holy Names University

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Castillo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Holy Names University. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7245

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO, CHARLES

Defendant

HOLY NAMES UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAMMOND, JULIAN

VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.

GELLER, JASON A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/3/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Tentative Case Management Order

7/28/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Holy Names University

6/21/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Holy Names University

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

6/22/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

Stipulation (Joint) to Continue the June 29, 2021 Initial Case Management Conference Filed

6/22/2021: Stipulation (Joint) to Continue the June 29, 2021 Initial Case Management Conference Filed

Case Management Conference 06/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

5/4/2021: Case Management Conference 06/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

5/28/2021: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Holy Names University

9/8/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Holy Names University

First Amended Complaint Filed

8/6/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service by Email re First Amended Class Action Complaint Filed

8/6/2021: Proof of Service by Email re First Amended Class Action Complaint Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/10/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Amend Complaint - Dropped

8/10/2021: Motion to Amend Complaint - Dropped

Notice of Of Withdrawal Of Revised Motion For Leave To File first Amended Complaint Filed

8/5/2021: Notice of Of Withdrawal Of Revised Motion For Leave To File first Amended Complaint Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Charles Castillo

8/5/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Charles Castillo

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

8/5/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Holy Names University

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Amend Complaint; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/08/2022 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Charles Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMotion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 07/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail State Bar of California Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Holy Names University Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 06/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMOND JULIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER, JASON A