This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 04:07:24 (UTC).

Castellanos VS Farrahkan

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Castellanos filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Farrahkan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0961

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTELLANOS, ALEJANDRA

Defendant

FARRANHKAN, KAREEM C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBKE, MARK E.

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for Kareem C. Farranhkan

9/15/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Kareem C. Farranhkan

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

7/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

8/6/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/8/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

6/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

3/26/2021: Case Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint Fraud Filed

11/16/2020: Complaint Fraud Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alejandra Castellanos

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alejandra Castellanos

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/16/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

12/1/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/1/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Kareem C. Farranhkan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/10/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Alejandra Castellanos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alejandra Castellanos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBKE, MARK E.