This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 18:31:07 (UTC).

CASSELES VS CASSELES

Case Summary

On 10/06/2000 CASSELES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CASSELES. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III, STEPHEN F. FOLAND and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9474

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

STEPHEN F. FOLAND

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASSELES, JUTTA

Respondent

CASSELES, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BLAHA, JEROME A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion re; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2004
  • DocketStipulation and Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2004
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • DocketStatement of Issues Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2004
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion re; Judge: Cherie T. Davis, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketHearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 707 date: 12/07/2004 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • DocketLetter re Engagement Terms Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion re; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2000
  • DocketStipulation and Order (PINK)FOR TEMP.CC,CV,CS,SS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2000
  • DocketConfidential Record (FCS)FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2000
  • DocketResponsive Declaration TO OSC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2000
  • DocketResponse FILED, FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2000
  • DocketFamily Court Services Counselor Assigned to Case: BRIAN JOHNSON V0002494

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2000
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 11/21/2000 09:00 AM D-707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2000
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause FOR CC,CV,CS,SS,AFS(PTNR) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2000
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: 10/7/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2000
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2000
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAHA, JEROME A.