This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 14:58:44 (UTC).

Cashcall Inc. VS Silva

Case Summary

On 10/28/2009 Cashcall Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Silva. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR., JOHN MCMORROW and RICHARD WOOD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1614

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR.

JOHN MCMORROW

RICHARD WOOD,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

CASHCALL INC.

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant

SILVA, PAUL

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

5/17/2011: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Writ of Execution - Satisfied from Sacramento Filed

3/24/2011: Writ of Execution - Satisfied from Sacramento Filed

Memo of Costs Filed for Cashcall Inc.

8/13/2010: Memo of Costs Filed for Cashcall Inc.

Judgment Entered

6/25/2010: Judgment Entered

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

6/25/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/25/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

5/28/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

5/28/2010: Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

5/28/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 603 date: 05/28/2010 time: 02:00 PM

2/19/2010: Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 603 date: 05/28/2010 time: 02:00 PM

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

2/19/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/17/2009: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

10/28/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Satisfied from Sacramento Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Sacramento

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Cashcall Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: George C. Hernandez, Jr.; Department: Dept 607

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Richard Wood, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: John McMorrow; Department: Dept 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 603 date: 05/28/2010 time: 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 02/19/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant