This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 14:21:02 (UTC).

Cashcall Inc. VS Montoya

Case Summary

On 02/23/2010 Cashcall Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Montoya. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR. and RICHARD WOOD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9915

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR.

RICHARD WOOD,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

MONTOYA, TIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MIELE, KENNETH J.

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/23/2010: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

3/9/2010: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

5/28/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

5/28/2010: Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

5/28/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/25/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

6/25/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

Judgment Entered

6/25/2010: Judgment Entered

Memo of Costs Filed for Cashcall Inc.

8/10/2010: Memo of Costs Filed for Cashcall Inc.

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

9/18/2012: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution

9/26/2012: Rejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Cashcall Inc.

10/22/2012: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Cashcall Inc.

Memo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

10/22/2012: Memo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

Assignment of Judgment Filed

10/23/2012: Assignment of Judgment Filed

Memo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

8/12/2013: Memo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

10/16/2013: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

4/7/2014: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

3/11/2015: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn on Writ from Los Angeles Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Unsatisfied from Santa Clara Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Santa Clara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Santa Clara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for White & Whitley Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of - Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Richard Wood, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 607 date: 06/25/2010 time: 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIELE KENNETH J. ESQ.