This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/18/2023 at 06:35:51 (UTC).

KETCHUM vs GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2023 KETCHUM filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Evelio Grillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9389

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Evelio Grillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Ketchum

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Inc.

DSM Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline, LLC

Kaiser Permanente International

Patheon Manufacturing Services, LLC

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Sin-Ting Liu

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/24/2023: Complaint

Summons on Complaint

07/24/2023: Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

07/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Complex Determination Hearing

07/24/2023: Notice of Complex Determination Hearing

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Tentative Ruling (Complex Determination Hearing)

08/21/2023: Tentative Ruling (Complex Determination Hearing)

Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing)

08/23/2023: Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing)

Order re: Complex Determination Hearing

08/23/2023: Order re: Complex Determination Hearing

Notice of Addition of Case to JCCP 5150

09/26/2023: Notice of Addition of Case to JCCP 5150

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2023

HearingDescription: Initial Case Management Conference; Dept: RCD / Department 21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Addition of Case to JCCP 5150 Filed by: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketMessage: The case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 updated: Result Date to 08/23/2023 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketMessage: Order re: Complex Determination Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketMessage: Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing); Category: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketMessage: Tentative Ruling Published for 08/23/2023 3:30 PM Complex Determination Hearing}; Category: Tentative Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Evelio Grillo in Department 21 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 03:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Complex Determination Hearing Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Jason Ketchum (Plaintiff) As to: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Inc. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Jason Ketchum (Plaintiff) As to: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Inc. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Jason Ketchum (Plaintiff) As to: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Inc. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less