This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 16:31:28 (UTC).

Estate of Benjamin William Pinney

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 Estate of Benjamin William Pinney was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7592

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCDONALD, REGAN

Decedent

PINNEY, BENJAMIN WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BREWER, JANET L.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed

2/10/2023: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

2/14/2023: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

Proof of Subscribing Witness Filed

2/14/2023: Proof of Subscribing Witness Filed

Proposed Order Received

2/14/2023: Proposed Order Received

Notice of Remote Appearance Filed

2/14/2023: Notice of Remote Appearance Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 202; Action: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketProbate 03/27/2023 09:45 AM D- 202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less