This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 22:37:26 (UTC).

STERLING, et al. vs BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 STERLING, filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Brad Seligman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2728

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Brad Seligman

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Chattem, Inc.

Dyana Sterling

GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline plc

Patheon Manufacturing Services, LLC

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi SA

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Warren Postman

William Sterling

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/05/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/05/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/05/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Complex Determination Hearing

05/10/2023: Notice of Complex Determination Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Brad Seligman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Complex Determination Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 09:15 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: William Sterling (Plaintiff); Dyana Sterling (Plaintiff) As to: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: William Sterling (Plaintiff); Dyana Sterling (Plaintiff) As to: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V. (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less