This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:08:23 (UTC).

CASADO VS CASADO(DCSS)

Case Summary

On 12/06/2002 CASADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CASADO DCSS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALICE VILARDI, JACOB BLEA III and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2478

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ALICE VILARDI

JACOB BLEA III

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CASADO, CHRISTINA

Respondent

CASADO, MARIANO

Other

ALAMEDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHAMBERLIN, JOHN T.

LENAHAN, MAUREEN K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2011
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order for Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney Filed for CHRISTINA CASADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution as of February 28, 2007 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2007
  • DocketDeclaration for Uncontested Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2007
  • DocketStipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2007
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2003
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 03/18/2003 09:00 AM D-705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause FOR CC,CV,CS,SS,AFS(PTNR) CONTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 01/16/2003 09:00 AM D-705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause FOR CC,CV,CS,SS,AFS(PTNR) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration FILED BY PTNR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketDeclaration UCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERLIN, JOHN T.