This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 00:18:04 (UTC).

Carter VS Grayer

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Carter filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Grayer. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6877

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER, GEVON

Defendants

EULA, LEKAS

CRIST, SHANNON

GRAYER, DAMION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SOWDER, GREGORY J

BYNUM, JOHN T.

BUTTRY, WILLIAM G

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

2/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

Proof of Service by Mail re: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

2/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail re: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

11/13/2020: Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

11/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

10/29/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

Reply in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

10/20/2020: Reply in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/29/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

10/29/2020: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff

9/30/2020: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff

Answer to Complaint Filed for Damion Grayer

8/17/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Damion Grayer

Answer to Complaint Filed for Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula

8/17/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula

Re-Notice of Jury Fee Filed

8/17/2020: Re-Notice of Jury Fee Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gevon Carter

7/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gevon Carter

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/2/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shannon Crist Filed

7/16/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shannon Crist Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lekas Eula Filed

7/16/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lekas Eula Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail re: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 02/24/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Damion Grayer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Damion Grayer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Jury Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Shannon Crist, Lekas Eula

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Lekas Eula Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Shannon Crist Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/02/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gevon Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTTRY WILLIAM GEARHART

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOWDER, GREGORY J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYNUM, JOHN TERRELLE