Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 06:14:30 (UTC).

Carrillo VS ABM Industry Groups, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Carrillo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM Industry Groups, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3650

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO, CARLOS

Defendant

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COTTRELL, CAROLYN H

CHEMERS, ALEXANDER M.

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, LLC

7/20/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, LLC

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, L

6/22/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, L

Order to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint Filed

7/7/2021: Order to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

7/13/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance Filed for Carlos Carrillo

7/6/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance Filed for Carlos Carrillo

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

6/9/2021: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to ABM Industry Groups, LLC Filed

5/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to ABM Industry Groups, LLC Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

5/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/12/2021: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Denied

5/12/2021: Motion Denied

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

3/30/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/30/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carlos Carrillo

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carlos Carrillo

Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

4/1/2021: Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance Filed for Carlos Carrillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 21 date: 06/15/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to ABM Industry Groups, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Other Employment; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 06/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 05/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carlos Carrillo

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COTTRELL CAROLYN