This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 02:27:59 (UTC).

Carreiro VS Johnson & Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Carreiro filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5189

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARREIRO, JOHN

REID-CARREIRO, KATHRYN

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA, L.L.C.

SAFEWAY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOSI, JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 09/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

7/21/2021: Case Management Conference 09/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

First Amended Complaint Filed

10/5/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

10/5/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/1/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to appoint successor in interest Granted

10/1/2021: Motion to appoint successor in interest Granted

Motion to appoint successor in interest Filed by John Carreiro, Kathryn Reid-Carreiro

9/9/2021: Motion to appoint successor in interest Filed by John Carreiro, Kathryn Reid-Carreiro

Case Management Statement of John Carreiro, Kathryn Reid-Carreiro Filed

9/1/2021: Case Management Statement of John Carreiro, Kathryn Reid-Carreiro Filed

Order - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

7/20/2021: Order - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

7/20/2021: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

7/20/2021: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

7/20/2021: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

Complaint Asbestos Filed

7/12/2021: Complaint Asbestos Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/12/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Carreiro

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Carreiro

Notice of Posting Jury Fees, Demand for Jury Trial by Jury and Estimate Length of Trial Filed

7/12/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees, Demand for Jury Trial by Jury and Estimate Length of Trial Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to appoint successor in interest; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to appoint successor in interest Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 09/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees, Demand for Jury Trial by Jury and Estimate Length of Trial Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Carreiro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LONGS DRUG STORES CALIFORNIA L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant