This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 08:46:24 (UTC).

Carns VS Carns (NON DCSS)

Case Summary

On 03/11/2009 Carns filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Carns NON DCSS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALICE VILARDI and DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1006

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ALICE VILARDI

DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARNS, LARISSA

Respondent

CARNS, JEREMY

Other

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BREGA, MATTHEW A.

ROYCE, GARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice Regarding Payment of Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • DocketOrder After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion for Modification; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketProof of Service Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketNotice Regarding Payment of Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Order to Show Cause Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketRequest Re: Telephone Standby Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketDeclaration in Support Opposition to Ex Parte Application Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Order to Show Cause Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous Order After Hearing of August 29, 2007 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous OSC Re Modification of Custody, Support, Atty Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketProof of Service /Personal on OSC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketProof of Service /Personal on OSC Response Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Order to Show Cause Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Larissa Carns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROYCE, GARY