This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 20:15:48 (UTC).

Callender-Johnson VS Johnson (DCSS)

Case Summary

On 11/09/2005 Callender-Johnson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Johnson DCSS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUE ALEXANDER, ALICE VILARDI, CHARLES SMILEY, JACOB BLEA III and STEPHEN M. PULIDO, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1266

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

SUE ALEXANDER

ALICE VILARDI

CHARLES SMILEY

JACOB BLEA III

STEPHEN M. PULIDO, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALLENDER-JOHNSON, MELISA

Respondent

JOHNSON, EZEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SZYDLIK, JASON

WALDRON, MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketOrder After Hearing 1/19/2012 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re; Judge: Sue Alexander; Department: Dept 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketMediation Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees As to Melisa Callender-Johnson Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees Filed for Melisa Callender-Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees As to Melisa Callender-Johnson Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees Filed for Melisa Callender-Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2006
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketMiscellaneous Form Interrogatories Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketResponse to Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed for Ezel Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Ezel Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2005
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Dissolution of Marriage As to Ezel Johnson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Melisa Callender-Johnson Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Melisa Callender-Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2005
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Joseph Szydlik