This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 11:07:45 (UTC).

California Spine and Neurosur VS Aetna Life Insurance Compan

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 California Spine and Neurosur filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aetna Life Insurance Compan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7931

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY INSTITUTE

Defendants

AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

SALESFORCE.COM, INC.

HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MAUL, ANTHONY F

DECKER, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/10/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

2/10/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/2/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute

Complaint - Other Contract Filed

2/2/2021: Complaint - Other Contract Filed

Case Management Statement of California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute Filed

6/2/2021: Case Management Statement of California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Aetna Life Insurance Company , Holman Automobile Group, Inc. , Salesfo

5/28/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Aetna Life Insurance Company , Holman Automobile Group, Inc. , Salesfo

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

6/14/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

6/18/2021: Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Other Contract

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 01/23/2023 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/06/2023 11:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 12/19/2022 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketReferred to Court Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Aetna Life Insurance Company , Holman Automobile Group, Inc. , Salesfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Spine and Neurosurgey Institute is a litigant

Latest cases where AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant