This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 09:42:46 (UTC).

California Casualty Indemnity Exchange VS Pineda

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 California Casualty Indemnity Exchange filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pineda. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3902

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE

Defendant

PINEDA, CARLOS ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHWARZ, MARC A.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Venue Filed

7/7/2021: Declaration Venue Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Casualty Indemnity Exchange

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Casualty Indemnity Exchange

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

7/7/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/7/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/8/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

7/8/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Carlos Alberto Pineda Filed

7/15/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Carlos Alberto Pineda Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Carlos Alberto Pineda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for California Casualty Indemnity Exchange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.