Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 03:20:14 (UTC).

Cafiso VS Seidman

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Cafiso filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Seidman. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0962

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CAFISO, CHRISTINA

ROYAL-EISENBERG, MAXIMILIAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SEIDMAN, LAURA

GARCIA-ALVAREZ, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EZRIN, JOSHUA C.

MUIR, SHARON SANNER

 

Court Documents

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

9/15/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

9/15/2020: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Joint Stipulation to Strike Pltfs' Claim/Dismiss Defts Filed

9/2/2020: Joint Stipulation to Strike Pltfs' Claim/Dismiss Defts Filed

Case Management Statement of Christina Cafiso, Maximilian Royal-Eisenberg Filed

9/14/2020: Case Management Statement of Christina Cafiso, Maximilian Royal-Eisenberg Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

9/26/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Cross-Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

7/29/2020: Cross-Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

Answer to Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

7/29/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Garcia-Alvarez Filed

7/1/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Garcia-Alvarez Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Laura Seidman Filed

7/1/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Laura Seidman Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

5/14/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christina Cafiso

5/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christina Cafiso

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/12/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/31/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 09/17/2021 02:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Strike Pltfs' Claim/Dismiss Defts Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Laura Seidman, Maria Garcia-Alvarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Laura Seidman Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Garcia-Alvarez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christina Cafiso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EZRIN, JOSHUA C.