This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2022 at 08:30:59 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS Soy

Case Summary

On 08/02/2010 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Soy. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9096

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CACH, LLC

Perla M. Soy

Rudy Gaba, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Proposed Judgment Request

10/21/2010: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

10/21/2010: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

Declaration re Waiver of Attorney Fees Request

10/21/2010: Declaration re Waiver of Attorney Fees Request

Declaration to Substitute Copies in lieu of Original Request

10/21/2010: Declaration to Substitute Copies in lieu of Original Request

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

10/21/2010: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

Declaration Request

10/21/2010: Declaration Request

Declaration Other: Request

10/21/2010: Declaration Other: Request

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

08/15/2013: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Sacramento County Filed Sacramento County

04/04/2013: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Sacramento County Filed Sacramento County

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC

11/01/2011: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Sacramento Filed Sacramento

10/12/2011: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Sacramento Filed Sacramento

Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC

01/27/2011: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC

Notice of Change of Address Filed

10/28/2010: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Default Judgment (Money) Entered Default & Default Judgment (Money)

10/21/2010: Default Judgment (Money) Entered Default & Default Judgment (Money)

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Perla M. Soy Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

10/21/2010: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Perla M. Soy Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Perla M. Soy Filed

08/30/2010: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Perla M. Soy Filed

Declaration pursuant to ccp 395(b) Filed

08/02/2010: Declaration pursuant to ccp 395(b) Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

08/02/2010: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2013
  • DocketMessage: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Sacramento County Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution Issued To Sacramento; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Sacramento Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMessage: Abstract of Judgment Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketMessage: Writ of Execution Issued To Sacramento; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketMessage: Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for CACH, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Request; Category: DCL041

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Default Judgment (Money); Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As to Perla M. Soy Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Perla M. Soy Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Perla M. Soy Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration pursuant to ccp 395(b) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CACH, LLC; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant