Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 01:47:02 (UTC).

Cabrera VS Scottish Rite Temple Association of Oakland

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Cabrera filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Scottish Rite Temple Association of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2043

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA, HECTOR

Defendants

KAO, FREDERICK

LOUI, FRANK

SCOTTISH RITE TEMPLE ASSOCIATION OF OAKLAND, CALIFORNIA

SCOTTISH RITE VALLEY OF OAKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

POST, JOHN

SMITH, KRISTIN A.

VANCE, NATLIE P

SULLIVAN, DONALD P.

ARIAS, CATHY L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Hector Cabrera Filed

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Hector Cabrera Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao Entered

3/3/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao Entered

Notice of Settlement Filed for Hector Cabrera

3/3/2021: Notice of Settlement Filed for Hector Cabrera

Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication

1/8/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Frederick Kao

3/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Frederick Kao

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland

1/30/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Frank Loui

12/4/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Frank Loui

Returned Mail: Case Management Order dated 10/15/19 Filed

11/5/2019: Returned Mail: Case Management Order dated 10/15/19 Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/7/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Complaint Taken Under Submission

11/7/2019: Demurrer to Complaint Taken Under Submission

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

10/8/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

10/16/2019: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao

8/30/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao

Declaration of Semurring or Moving Party in Support of Atuomatic Extension Filed

9/3/2019: Declaration of Semurring or Moving Party in Support of Atuomatic Extension Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

6/10/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 10/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Cabrera

6/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Cabrera

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/22/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Frank Loui Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Frank Loui Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Hector Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 03/24/2021 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 03/24/2021 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 03/24/2021 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Frank Loui

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Temple Association of Oakland, California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Semurring or Moving Party in Support of Atuomatic Extension Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland , Frederick Kao

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Frederick Kao, Scottish Rite Valley of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hector Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, KRISTIN A