This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/01/2021 at 02:02:48 (UTC).

Cabrera VS Heaton

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Cabrera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Heaton. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6386

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA, LUZ

Defendant

HEATON, GRAHAM SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OWENS, MARQUIS D.

DESPOTES ESQ, ERIC D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/1/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/5/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/20/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

10/8/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/13/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

10/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

10/6/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Graham Scott Heaton Filed

9/22/2020: Case Management Statement of Graham Scott Heaton Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Luz Cabrera

8/3/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Luz Cabrera

Compliance Hearing 10/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

8/6/2020: Compliance Hearing 10/06/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint Filed for Graham Scott Heaton

7/28/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint Filed for Graham Scott Heaton

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

4/16/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Initial Case Management Conference 04/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

12/11/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/11/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Dismissal; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion to Quash Service of Summons Purs. to 418.10 CCP 08/19/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons Purs. to 418.10 CCP Reservation Set for dept: 19 date: 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Luz Cabrera Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Luz Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Luz Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEPOSTES, ERIC D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OWENS, MARQUIS D.