This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 06:01:40 (UTC).

Butler VS Abeck

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Butler filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Abeck. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0118

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUTLER, SHELBIE

Respondent

ABECK, BERNDT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Verified Petition for Order Permitting Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

5/27/2021: Notice of Hearing on Verified Petition for Order Permitting Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

Petition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

5/17/2021: Petition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

Proposed Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

5/14/2021: Proposed Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery

5/14/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery

Notice of of Payment of Court Reporter Fee Filed

5/14/2021: Notice of of Payment of Court Reporter Fee Filed

Declaration of Rogelo Serrano in Support of Verified Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discove

5/14/2021: Declaration of Rogelo Serrano in Support of Verified Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discove

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shelbie Butler

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shelbie Butler

Petition - Other Filed

5/14/2021: Petition - Other Filed

Opposition to Petition Filed

6/15/2021: Opposition to Petition Filed

Reply in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

7/9/2021: Reply in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

Motion - Motion Rescheduled

7/26/2021: Motion - Motion Rescheduled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

7/26/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 511; Action: Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 511 date: 08/17/2021 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing Confirmed for 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed by Shelbie Butler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Petition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Petition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Verified Petition for Order Permitting Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other 07/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Payment of Court Reporter Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Rogelo Serrano in Support of Verified Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discove

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Order for Pre-Commencement Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shelbie Butler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.