This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 04:03:59 (UTC).

Burns VS Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Burns filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Matson Navigation Company, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9387

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURNS, ROBERT

Defendant

MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CAVIN JR, LYLE C.

KUHNE JR, JAMES F

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

2/22/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Burns

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Burns

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/22/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/25/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

2/25/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

4/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

6/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Robert Burns Filed

6/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Robert Burns Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

7/13/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

8/9/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 01/18/2023 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/30/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 02/10/2023 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Matson Navigation Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/07/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Robert Burns Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Burns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAVIN JR, LYLE C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUHNE JAMES F