This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 18:49:31 (UTC).

Burgess VS Kardooni

Case Summary

On 09/09/2003 Burgess filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kardooni. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL ALWEISS and FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5595

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL ALWEISS

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

BURGESS, JACK A

Defendant and Other

KARDOONI, REZA

 

Court Documents

Judgment Entered

11/19/2003: Judgment Entered

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

11/19/2003: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

11/19/2003: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 601 date: 11/19/2003 time: 08:30 AM

11/5/2003: Hearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 601 date: 11/19/2003 time: 08:30 AM

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

11/5/2003: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

9/15/2003: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/9/2003: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2003
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Daniel Alweiss; Department: Dept 601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2003
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 601 date: 11/19/2003 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2003
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Valid As to Reza Kardooni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 11/05/2003 08:30 AM D- 601

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less