This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 04:59:17 (UTC).

Brown VS AGCO Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AGCO Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3620

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Defendants

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

A. H. VOSS COMPANY

CNH INDUSTRIAL AMERICA, LLC

SCOTTS VALLEY SPRINKLER

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

TAYLOR PLUMBING SUPPLY COMPANY

WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP, INC.

A.L. LEASE COMPANY

JAMES JONES COMPANY OF DELAWARE, LLC.

PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC.

AGCO CORPORATION

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

WESTBURNE SUPPLY, INC.

T.W. SMITH COMPANY

PROVENZANO BROS.

NAVISTAR, INC.

J & S INDUSTRIES

KEENAN PROPERTIES, INC.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

COWPERTHWAITE, JOHN G.

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

WAH, DOUGLAS G.

MCCORMICK, JENNIFER M.

BLAIR, LYNNE P.

LAZARUS ESQ, LISA H

CHAVES, MARISA R.

BERGSTROM, EMILY D.

MEYER, JASON F.

HUTH, HILLARY H

HARUTHUNIAN, ZORIK

SAYRE, ANGELA V.

BELLOW, REBECCA A.

BRYDON, JOHN R.

COSTA, AARON D.

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

ENGEL, ROBERT G.

LIN, CARRIE S

OSTRANDER, RACHEL

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/3/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/30/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

8/20/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

4/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

9/28/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for CNH Industrial America, LLC

9/28/2021: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for CNH Industrial America, LLC

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for A. H. Voss Company

9/29/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for A. H. Voss Company

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Mueller Co. LLC

9/29/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Mueller Co. LLC

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Granite Construction

10/1/2021: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Granite Construction

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for GCO, Inc.

10/1/2021: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for GCO, Inc.

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Taylor Plumbing Supply Company

9/24/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Taylor Plumbing Supply Company

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

9/27/2021: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

9/28/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for GCO, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Granite Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Mueller Co. LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for A. H. Voss Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for CNH Industrial America, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Westburne Supply, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Loren W. Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & S INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases where T.W. SMITH COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CLAY PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVENZANO BROS. is a litigant