This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 05:40:50 (UTC).

Brooks VS Rogers

Case Summary

On 03/20/2001 Brooks filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rogers. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Berkeley Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROL BROSNAHAN and DIRCK NEWBURY, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6035

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Berkeley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CAROL BROSNAHAN

DIRCK NEWBURY, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

BROOKS, THERESA

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant

ROGERS, YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JENNER, KENNETH W

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Theresa Brooks

3/20/2001: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Theresa Brooks

Complaint Unlawful Detainer

3/20/2001: Complaint Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

3/20/2001: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Yolanda Rogers

3/27/2001: Answer to Complaint Filed for Yolanda Rogers

Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Yolanda Rogers Granted

3/27/2001: Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Yolanda Rogers Granted

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

4/4/2001: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Civil Court Trial 04/23/2001 11:00 AM D- 203

4/4/2001: Civil Court Trial 04/23/2001 11:00 AM D- 203

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/23/2001: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Ruling Taken Under Submission

4/23/2001: Ruling Taken Under Submission

Judgment Entered

4/23/2001: Judgment Entered

Stipulation Stip to Pro Tem Judge Filed

4/23/2001: Stipulation Stip to Pro Tem Judge Filed

Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Yolanda Rogers

5/11/2001: Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Yolanda Rogers

Civil Ex-Parte 05/14/2001 11:00 AM D- 201

5/11/2001: Civil Ex-Parte 05/14/2001 11:00 AM D- 201

Proposed Order Filed

5/11/2001: Proposed Order Filed

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

5/14/2001: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

5/30/2001: Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed

Order Release of Funds in Trust Filed

10/22/2002: Order Release of Funds in Trust Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Release of Funds in Trust Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Satisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession); Judge: Carol Brosnahan; Department: Dept 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Ex-Parte 05/14/2001 11:00 AM D- 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte 05/14/2001 11:00 AM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for Yolanda Rogers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Dirck Newbury, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 203

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 04/23/2001 11:00 AM D- 203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Yolanda Rogers Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Yolanda Rogers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Yolanda Rogers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Theresa Brooks

    Read MoreRead Less