Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 01:40:50 (UTC).

Brooks VS Huynh

Case Summary

On 06/02/2011 Brooks filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Huynh. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS RASCH, SUSAN LEW, JOHN ALLEN, KRISTIN L. ROSI, ROBERT BAYSINGER, JAMES WOOD, RICHARD WOOD, GLENN RITCHEY, KAREN RODRIGUE and DEJUNG, TED. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8570

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS RASCH

SUSAN LEW

JOHN ALLEN

KRISTIN L. ROSI

ROBERT BAYSINGER

JAMES WOOD

RICHARD WOOD

GLENN RITCHEY

KAREN RODRIGUE

DEJUNG, TED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKS, ANDREW

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

HUYNH, THUY

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment Filed

9/2/2011: Assignment of Judgment Filed

Order of Examination Issued

9/20/2011: Order of Examination Issued

Memo of Costs Filed for Andrew Brooks

10/5/2011: Memo of Costs Filed for Andrew Brooks

Motion: For Sanctions Filed

12/15/2011: Motion: For Sanctions Filed

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

7/16/2012: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/27/2012: Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion: For Earnings Withholding Order Granted

8/27/2012: Motion: For Earnings Withholding Order Granted

Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

9/25/2012: Motion to Vacate Small Claims Judgment Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

10/2/2012: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

10/9/2012: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Miscellaneous Notice of Entry of Order Filed

11/13/2012: Miscellaneous Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Miscellaneous re: Notice of continuance of Judgment Debtor Filed

11/19/2012: Miscellaneous re: Notice of continuance of Judgment Debtor Filed

Miscellaneous Notice of Trial.Hearing Filed

11/26/2012: Miscellaneous Notice of Trial.Hearing Filed

OEX - Sworn and Examined Only

12/18/2012: OEX - Sworn and Examined Only

Request Re: Payment of Judgment in Installments Denied

4/12/2013: Request Re: Payment of Judgment in Installments Denied

Returned Mail: Minutes Filed

4/23/2013: Returned Mail: Minutes Filed

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Filed

1/27/2015: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

4/21/2015: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Unsatisfied from Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minutes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketMinutes: Payment of Judgment in Installments; Judge: Thomas Rasch; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Payment of Judgment in Installments Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketMinutes: Payment of Judgment in Installments; Judge: Kristin L. Rosi; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Law and Motion dept: 702 date: 04/12/2013 time: 09:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Andrew Brooks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: DeJung, Ted Commissioner; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Thuy Huynh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 07/20/2011 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less