This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:56:24 (UTC).

Bridgeside Properties, LLC VS Subway Real Estate, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Bridgeside Properties, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Subway Real Estate, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3045

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGESIDE PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MARTIN III, ROBERT B

RAUCH JR., WILLIAM D.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/5/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

8/19/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/26/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

6/19/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/26/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/31/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

6/19/2020: Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/31/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

7/15/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 09/21/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

7/15/2020: Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 09/21/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/05/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/05/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 06/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

3/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 06/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Subway Real Estate, LLC Filed

2/13/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Subway Real Estate, LLC Filed

At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

2/13/2020: At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

At-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

2/14/2020: At-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

Master Jury Trial 03/16/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

2/18/2020: Master Jury Trial 03/16/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Answer to Complaint Filed for Subway Real Estate, LLC

2/10/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Subway Real Estate, LLC

Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

2/4/2020: Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/3/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

2/3/2020: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bridgeside Properties, LLC

2/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bridgeside Properties, LLC

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 09/21/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/31/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/26/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 08/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/05/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Master Jury Trial 06/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/10/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMaster Jury Trial 03/16/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Subway Real Estate, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Subway Real Estate, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bridgeside Properties, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less