This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/12/2020 at 03:59:35 (UTC).

Bridgeporte Community Association, Inc. a Califor VS Furnish

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Bridgeporte Community Association, Inc a Califor filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Furnish. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY BRAND, NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6246

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY BRAND

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIDGEPORTE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

FURNISH, MADELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KERMOTT, BRUCE R

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

5/28/2020: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Case Management Statement of Madeline Furnish Filed

11/19/2019: Case Management Statement of Madeline Furnish Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Madeline Furnish Filed

8/20/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Madeline Furnish Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/7/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Order ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed

7/25/2019: Order ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Filed

Bond Filed for Plaintiff

7/31/2019: Bond Filed for Plaintiff

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

7/23/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/25/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Granted

7/25/2019: Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Granted

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Other Real Property As to Madeline Furnish Filed

7/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Other Real Property As to Madeline Furnish Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

7/17/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Madeline Furnish Filed

7/17/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Madeline Furnish Filed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - of Jay Cashman

7/11/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - of Jay Cashman

Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued

7/15/2019: Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

7/15/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/10/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/9/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

7/9/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Bridgeporte Community Association, Inc. a California Nonprofit Mutual B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Bridgeporte Community Association, Inc. a California Nonprofit Mutual B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Madeline Furnish Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Shazneen Shaheed Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - of Jay Cashman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Reservation Set for dept: 511 date: 07/1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bridgeporte Community Association, Inc. a California Nonprofit Mutu

    Read MoreRead Less