This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 14:39:38 (UTC).

Branzuela VS Rezn 8 Financial Services

Case Summary

On 12/08/2009 Branzuela filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rezn 8 Financial Services. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JULIA SPAIN and RICHARD WOOD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8405

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JULIA SPAIN

RICHARD WOOD,

 

Party Details

Other and Plaintiff

BRANZUELA, ANTHONY

Debtor / Appellees and Defendants

ALI, ZULIFIGAR

REZN 8 FINANCIAL SERVICES

 

Court Documents

Judgment Entered

6/25/2010: Judgment Entered

Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

6/25/2010: Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

Small Claims Appeal 06/25/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

5/21/2010: Small Claims Appeal 06/25/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

5/21/2010: Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

Judgment Entered

4/29/2010: Judgment Entered

Claim of Defendant Taken Under Submission

4/16/2010: Claim of Defendant Taken Under Submission

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

4/16/2010: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

4/16/2010: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/16/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

4/14/2010: Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

4/5/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Claim of Defendant Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services, Zulifigar Ali

4/5/2010: Claim of Defendant Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services, Zulifigar Ali

Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 04/16/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

3/23/2010: Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 04/16/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

Request Re: Postponement Granted

3/22/2010: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services

3/15/2010: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/8/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Appeal of SC Judgment; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff on Claim of Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal 06/25/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal of SC Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff on Claim of Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2010
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Zulifigar Ali Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Defendant Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services, Zulifigar Ali

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 04/16/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for Rezn 8 Financial Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/26/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less