This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 04:40:43 (UTC).

Bockmon & Woody Electric Co., VS North American Specialty In

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Bockmon Woody Electric Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against North American Specialty In. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9161

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOCKMON & WOODY ELECTRIC CO., INC.

Defendant

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RON, NATALI A

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

8/23/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

8/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bockmon & Woody Electric Co., Inc.

7/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bockmon & Woody Electric Co., Inc.

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

7/16/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bockmon & Woody Electric Co., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ron, Natali A.