This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/14/2021 at 09:15:20 (UTC).

BOCCIO VS A.B. BOYD CO.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 BOCCIO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A B BOYD CO. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2576

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOCCIO, PHYLLIS

SPAGOPULOS, NORMA

Defendants

GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS YORK HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING

ASSOCIATED FLOW CONTROLS, INC.

A.B. BOYD CO.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

WARREN PUMPS LLC

MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

VALLEY RUBBER & GASKET COMPANY, NOW KNOWN AS LEWIS-GOETZ & COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PEDLEY KNOWLES & COMPANY

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

DAN CHARLES AGENCY

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SHINGLER, RONALD J.

BRODY, RICHARD A.

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES P.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Proof of Service by Electronic Services Re: Notice of Tentative Case Management Order Filed

2/3/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Services Re: Notice of Tentative Case Management Order Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

1/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

12/17/2020: Case Management Conference 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Proof of Service on Complaint As to DAN CHARLES AGENCY Filed

2/1/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to DAN CHARLES AGENCY Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to MOUNT VERNON MILLS, INC. Filed

2/1/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to MOUNT VERNON MILLS, INC. Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

2/3/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC. Filed

1/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY Filed

1/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY Filed

Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to PNEUMO ABEX LLC Filed

1/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to PNEUMO ABEX LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. Filed

1/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY Filed

1/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to LAMONS GASKET COMPANY Filed

1/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to LAMONS GASKET COMPANY Filed

Association of Attorneys Filed

12/23/2020: Association of Attorneys Filed

Complaint Asbestos Filed

12/14/2020: Complaint Asbestos Filed

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Electronic Services Re: Notice of Tentative Case Management Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for WARREN PUMPS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to VALLEY RUBBER & GASKET COMPANY, NOW KNOWN AS LEWIS-GOETZ & COMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to MOUNT VERNON MILLS, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to DAN CHARLES AGENCY Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for PHYLLIS BOCCIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant