This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/20/2020 at 02:39:57 (UTC).

Blumin VS Thomas

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Blumin filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNA WHITMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1453

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JENNA WHITMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

BLUMIN, JONATHAN

Defendant and Other

THOMAS , PRAVEEN

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

10/22/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

10/22/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Judgment Entered

10/22/2019: Judgment Entered

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Praveen Thomas

8/8/2019: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Praveen Thomas

Request Re: Postponement Granted

8/12/2019: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 10/22/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

8/13/2019: Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 10/22/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

6/14/2019: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

6/4/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/22/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 10/22/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketHearing Restored: Small Claims Court Trial 08/14/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for Praveen Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/14/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 08/14/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less